Reid v. Lay et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Defendant: Gaylon Lay, J Smith and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00080
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 81 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered, and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/29/2013. (dmn)
November 19, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 68 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/19/12. (vjt)
July 20, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/20/12. (kpr)
July 5, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 36 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 19 Motion for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/5/12. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 7/6/2012 to correct the file date.) (thd).
May 29, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Aundrea Weekly (originally sued as A Weakly). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/29/12. (vjt)
May 10, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER rescinding 22 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and Amendment (Doc. Nos. 8, 12) on deft Weakly in care of the ADC Compliance Offic, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71655-0550, without prepayment of fees and costs. Defts are directed to file a response to pltf's motion for order within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/10/12. (kpr)
April 25, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Hobbs is dismissed from pltf's complaint; Ray Hobbs terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/12. (vjt)
April 4, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defts Gaylon Lay and J. Smith in care of the ADC Compliance Office, P. O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71655-0550, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/4/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Lay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?