Page v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: David Page
Defendant: Richard Clark and Blair
Case Number: 5:2012cv00093
Filed: March 7, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and approving 76 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 75 Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss his complaint and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice; and denying, as moot, all pending motions. It is further certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivoulous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/18/2013. (kdr)
October 19, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 Partial Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge, denying Page's 37 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/19/2012. (mcz)
June 26, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 16 Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/26/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?