Cowgill v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery Cowgill
Defendant: Does, Moncrief, Marie Austin, William Warren, James G Thurman, III, Bruce L Green, Gaylon Lay, Mark Warner, D W Tate, Wendy Kelly, Holthof, Ray Hobbs, Corizon and Rory Griffin
Case Number: 5:2012cv00112
Filed: March 28, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge: Defendants' 61 and 64 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. Plaintiff's 1983 claims against Holthoff, Thurman, Austin and Corizon, Inc., are DISM ISSED without prejudice; Plaintiff's 1983 mental health claims against Warren are DISMISSED without prejudice; Plaintiff's 1983 claims against Green, Moncrief, Tate, Warner and Warren are DISMISSED with prejudice; Plaintiff's state civil rights claims are DISMISSED without prejudice; and Plaintiff's claims against "John/Jane Does" are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's 83 Motion to Compel is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/10/2013. (mcz)
April 29, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 23 Answer to Complaint. Defts Jeremy Moncrief, Donald Tate, and Christian Holtoff have supplied their correct names. The Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of these defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/13. (kpr)
September 24, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 39 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety with the exception of the recommendations as to Plaintiff's respondeat superior claims brought pursuant to the Arkansas Civil Rights Act; granting in part 24 Defendants& #039; Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with respect to Plaintiff's monetary claims against them in their official capacities; granting in part 24 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with respect to the § 1983 alleg ations against Defendants Hobbs, Kelley, Lay, and Griffin; denying 24 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with respect to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims against Defendants Warner, Holthoff, and Moncrief; and, denying 24 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with respect to their request to sever claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/2012. (dmn) (Modified on 9/24/2012 to correct typographical error.) (dmn).
May 1, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing Count IV of Plaintiff's 2 Complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/1/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowgill v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moncrief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G Thurman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce L Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D W Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holthof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Cowgill
Represented By: David O. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?