Jones v. Meinzer et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer, James Banks, Larry D May, Ray Hobbs, Benny Magness, Mary Parker, Ken Jones, Drew Baker, Alonza Jiles, Bobby Glover, Janis Walmsley, John Felts and Tyronne Broomfield
Case Number: 5:2012cv00117
Filed: March 30, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 131 Order, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Larry Wayne Jones on his injunctive relief RLUIPA claim against Defendants. Defendants shall grant Plaintiff a religious exemption to the ADC grooming policy. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/2015. (jak)
October 18, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT 86 Partial Report and Recommendation; defts' 46 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/13. (vjt)
August 27, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER amending 78 Order. Benny Magness is excused from being a witness at the August 28, 2013 Summary Judgment Hearing. Defendants shall ensure the attendance of witness Ray Hobbs at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/27/13. (kpr)
June 6, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a reply to the 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff may respond to the Reply within 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/6/13. (kpr)
July 31, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 10 MOTION to Correct this Court's Order directing service 9 , which is construed as a Motion to Dismiss Defendants Meinzer, Banks, and May from his Amended Complaint, is hereby GRANTED; Curtis Meinzer, James Banks, and Larry D May terminated. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Meinzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benny Magness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonza Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Walmsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyronne Broomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?