Aaron v. Anthony et al
Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Defendant: C Anthony, Grant Harris and Cashion
Case Number: 5:2012cv00121
Filed: April 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 34 Order entered in this case, Aaron's claims against Christine Anthony are dismissed with prejudice. His claims against all other Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2013. (dmn)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER adopting 13 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Aaron's claims against Defendants Cashion and Harris are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/22/2012. (dmn)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Sgt. C. Anthony. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on this deft in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/7/12. (kpr)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss Aaron's claims against all defendants--except defts Anthony, Cashion, and Grant Harris--without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Anthony et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?