Broach et al v. Arkansas Convalescent Centers Inc et al

Plaintiff: Stacy Broach, Lakita Brown, Jeanetta Johnson, Lovie Nolden and Gwendolyn Wilkerson
Defendant: Arkansas Convalescent Centers Inc, ACC1 LLC, Capstone Health Group LLC, Kyle M Deshotels and M N Osbourne
Case Number: 5:2012cv00143
Filed: April 24, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT against ACC1 LLC, Capstone Health Group LLC, and Kyle M Deshotels for the amounts specified within this Order, and for reasonable attorney's fees, costs, and expenses as agreed by the parties. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2014. (jak)
April 18, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion to Dismiss. Opt-in plaintiffs Alberta Baker, Chantey Collins, Chanell Henley, Joyce Mayweather, Linda Payne, and Tedric Mickens's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/18/2014. (jak)
April 7, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 122 Motion to decertify; partly granting and partly denying 125 Motion to strike; granting in part and and denying in part 119 Motion for partial summary judgment on the state law claims; and denying without prejudice 97 Motion for summary judgment about Deshotels's employer status. The Court will hold a pre-trial conference to handle any remaining matters. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/7/2014. (thd)
January 27, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 unopposed motion; dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs' claims against M.N. Osbourne and Arkansas Convalescent Centers, Inc.; and denying as moot 105 motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/2014. (mmd)
January 23, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 104 Motions to Dismiss Party. Opt-in plaintiffs Lakeisha Bobo, LaTreach Brown, Landra Clay, Trinette Ento, Laquita Fudge-Jones, Elbony Goins, Laquita Goodwin, Carol Gossage, Phyllis Hawkins, Deanna Henry-Jones, Barbara Lee, G loria Lyons, Kenicia McBride, Bambi Miller, Tia Okolo, Casee Smith, LaNorris Smith, Phenia Smith, Dominique Turner, Kristy Washington, Keylie Welch, and Erika Green's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)
November 1, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs Lola M. Clary, Kemberli Duvall, Eloise Fudge, Jana Hodges, Bobbie Rayner, Anna Treadwell, Cecelia Johnson, and Joanna Hunter, without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/1/13. (kpr)
July 25, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Certify Class; denying 44 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice. The revised draft notice and consent mirroring Roco must be filed (after collaboration) for Court approval by 2 August 2013. Useable electronic list due to Plaintiffs by 9 August 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/25/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broach et al v. Arkansas Convalescent Centers Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Broach
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakita Brown
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanetta Johnson
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovie Nolden
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Wilkerson
Represented By: Bryce William Ashby
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Represented By: Maryna O. Jackson
Represented By: Michael Muskheli
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: William B. Ryan
Represented By: Amber R. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Convalescent Centers Inc
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Represented By: Ellen Owens Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACC1 LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Health Group LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Represented By: Ellen Owens Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle M Deshotels
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Represented By: Ellen Owens Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M N Osbourne
Represented By: Michael S. Moore
Represented By: Ellen Owens Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?