Nichols v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Johnny Lee Nichols
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00152
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 54 Order dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/13. (kpr)
January 3, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Order; denying 18 Motion for Order; denying 23 Motion for Order; denying 25 Motion for Relief; denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 30 Motion for Prelimin ary Injunction; denying 30 Motion for TRO; denying 32 Motion for Order to Show Cause 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 39 Motion for TRO; and denying 39 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/03/2013. (kcs)
October 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 17 Motion for Default Judgment. Respondent shall file a responsive pleading within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/30/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Lee Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?