Mason v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Fredrick Mason
Defendant: Linnie Patrick, Agnes Thomas, Ray Hobbs, Gaylon Lay, Vernon Robertson, Marie Austin, Iona Wade, Cynthia Thompson, William Warren, Wendy Kelly, Christine Collins, Keith Day and Does
Case Number: 5:2012cv00160
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING 68 Report and Recommendations; therefore, 63 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the remaining defts Wade and Warren is GRANTED, and pltf's complaint 2 against them is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/11/13. (vjt)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 56 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Fredrick Mason. Defendant Cynthia Thomas will not be reinstated unless Plaintiff is able to provide a different last-known address for her. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/26/13. (kpr)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 38 Order dismissing deft Thompson. The defts have now provided Thompson's last-known address, which the Clerk is directed to file under seal. The Clerk is further directed to re-issue summons for Thompson at this new address and the United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint on deft at the address provided under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/27/13. (kpr)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER adopting in their entirety 31 Partial Recommended Disposition; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Thomas, Collins, and Patrick, and dismissing them from this action, with prejudice; and, dismissing Cynthia Thompson from this action, without prejudice, for failure to serve. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/12/2012. (dmn)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Fredrick Mason providing addresses for defts Iona Wade and William Warren. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Com plaint on defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Plaintiff should provide additional identifying information or a last-known address for deft Cynthia Thompson as soon as possible, or risk having her dismissed for failure to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/31/12. (kpr)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying pltf's 11 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/24/12. (vjt)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts Austin, Hobbs, Lay, Robertson, Day, and Kelly are DISMISSED from this action, for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/3/12. (vjt)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing that the Clerk prepare summons for defts Wade, Thompson, Warren, Thomas, Collins and Patrick, and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defts Thomas, Collins, and Patrick in care of the ADC Compliance Division. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defts Wade, Thompson and Warren in care of Humphries and Lewis Law firm. Plaintiff's 5 motion to appoint counsel is denied without prejudice at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/15/12. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 6/15/2012 to correct linkage and the description of the document filed.) (hph).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linnie Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agnes Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iona Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?