Roberts v. Austin et al

Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Defendant: M Austin and Estella Murrary/Bland
Case Number: 5:2012cv00166
Filed: May 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 60 Order entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/28/2014. (ks)
July 31, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts' 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; pltf's deliberate-indifference claims against defts Austin and Bland are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/31/13. (vjt)
March 12, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting, in all respects, 27 the Partial Recommended Disposition; and denying 24 Mr. Robert's' motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/12/2013. (kdr)
June 14, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/14/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Murrary/Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?