Clemons v. Hobbs
Plaintiff: James E Clemons
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00176
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER vacating this Court's September 8 2015 Order assessing the $505.00 appellate filing fee, 49 . The Court directs Clemons's custodian to stop collecting payments under that Order. And the Court directs the Clerk to refund any port ion of the appellate filing fee already collected. Clemons's custodian must return any refunded money to Clemons's prison trust account. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Division. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/9/2016. (jak)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT: Recommendation, 26 , declines, although the Court comes to the same conclusion on limitations after de novo review. Clemons's petition is dismissed. No certificate of appealability will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2015. (jak)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER directing Defendant to file a complete set of the record and briefs related to the appellate case No. CR09-1182 decided at 2010 Ark. 337, 369 S.W. 3d 710 by 5 September 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/26/2014. (jak)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER declining to adopt 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The case is referred back to Judge Volpe to sort out the filing issue and for further development in general. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Clemons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Eileen Woods Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?