Aaron v. Hicks et al

Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Defendant: K Howell, Leroy Hicks, M Lowe, Kevin Kelly, Maggart and S Faylor
Case Number: 5:2012cv00179
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. The claims are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute, failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and failure to respond to the Court's Order. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the related Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/15/2012. (mcz)
July 31, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 25 28 motions to dismiss, which the Court construes as motions for a more definite statement; pltf shall file an amended complaint as directed within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/31/12. (vjt)
June 20, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Kevin Kelly (originally sued as K. Kelly); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on deft Kelly (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL) without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/20/12. (vjt)
June 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Partial Report and Recommendations, and dismissing Aaron's claims against Arkansas Department of Correction and Delta Regional Unit with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/13/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Hicks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Faylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kameon Vankeis Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?