Gonder v. Hobbs
Plaintiff: Duane J Gonder
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00186
Filed: May 24, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying as moot 88 Motion to withdraw. 86 , 92 , & 93 motions for new trial, for an evidentiary hearing, and for judicial notice denied. 89 Motion for certificate of appealability is granted. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/22/2020. (jak)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Motions 70 & 74 granted. Gonder's motions for relief from the judgment, 66 & 67 , are withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2020. (jak)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 72 Motion to hold in abeyance without prejudice as moot. have considered whether, based on Gonder's new case, I should recuse in this case and other matters involving Gonder. I will withhold a final decision regarding recusal until after Gonder has an opportunity to weigh in, if he desires to do so. Any response from him on possible recusal is due by 7/28/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2020. (jak)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 64 Motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/8/2019. (jak)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER directing Gonder to seek and get permission from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit to file a second habeas petition before this Court can proceed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/24/2015. (jak)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying as moot 36 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/13/14. (kpr)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 17 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/2012. (mcz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonder v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane J Gonder
Represented By: Jeffery H. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?