Roberts v. Herrington et al
Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Defendant: Fitzpatrick, T Gibson, J Holstead, M Warner, Ray Hobbs, Raymond Naylor, G Lay, John Does, John Herrington, Levengood and V Robertson
Case Number: 5:2012cv00188
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in full 75 MOTION for reimbursement of out-of-pocket expenses. The Court directs the Clerk to reimburse these expenses and to put a copy of this Order and 75 in the Library Fund file maintained by the Clerk. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2014. (jak)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER relieving Christopher Heil as appointed counsel for Roberts with the Court's thanks. Any request for reimbursement of counsel's out of pocket expenses is due by 5 January 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/17/2014. (jak)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Brunson Roberts (ADC #127841 ), Varner SuperMax Unit, at 8:15 a.m. on 15 December 2014 and each day thereafter until completion of the trial located in Court room 1-A of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas. The ADC is further directed to send with Plaintiff his complete institutional and medical files. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/20/2014. (jak)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 48 MOTION to Continue filed by John Herrington, Brian Levengood. Trial is reset for December 15, 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/31/13. (kpr)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ADOPTING 35 Partial Report and Recommendations dismissing defendants Merlin Fitzpatrick and Tina Gibson without prejudice 2 34 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/4/13. (kpr)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 19 Partial Report and Recommendations. The John Does are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/17/12. (kpr)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing all claims not related to the alleged excessive-force incident on December 30, 2011, without prejudice, including claims against Ray Hobbs, Raymond Naylor, G. Lay, M. Warner, V. Robertson, and J. Holstead. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/29/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Herrington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Holstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levengood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunson Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?