Reid v. Meizner, et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, James Banks and Curtis Meizner
Case Number: 5:2012cv00230
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 101 Order entered on this date, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/11/2014. (mmd)
October 15, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 93 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment 84 is granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied. 88 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/13. (kpr)
August 28, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 50 and dismissing the claims regarding the confiscation of his personal property, the failure of Arkansas Department of Correction (ADC) employees to protect him while he was housed at the ADCs Cummins Unit, and the denial of his opportunity to participate in vocational programs, without prejudice 46 1 43 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/28/13. (kpr)
August 13, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere in all respects. Accordingly, 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Reid is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/13/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Meizner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?