McGraw v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Ramon Hosea McGraw
Defendant: Edward Adams and Does
Case Number: 5:2012cv00260
Filed: July 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue subpoenas for the USM to serve without prepayment of costs or fees therefore on Randy Jackson, Larry Gragg, and Jessie Nelson to appear at the jury trial scheduled 9/22/2015 at 9:00 a.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/16/2015. (lej)
September 14, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if counsel moves to withdraw, his motion will be granted. However, trial will proceed as scheduled and Mr. McGraw will represent himself. Plaintiff's counsel request for an extension is granted. He may file pretrial disclosures 9/21/2015. To ensure inmate witnesses are transported to the trial, Plaintiff's counsel shall identify Plaintiff's witnesses no later than Noon, 9/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/14/2015. (lej)
October 15, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, all pending motions 11 20 are denied without prejudice; this case is administratively closed pending final disposition of pltf's state case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Hosea McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?