Dillard v. Meinzer et al

Plaintiff: John Wayne Dillard
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer, James Banks and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00270
Filed: July 18, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 21 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/12/2012. (dmn)
August 2, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, Amended Complaint 10 , and this Order on defts without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/2/12. (vjt)
July 25, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER modifying 7 Order as set forth in this Order and striking from the record the 4 Amended Complaint and 2 Complaint filed by John Wayne Dillard. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order and the July 18, 2012 Order to the Ward en, Varner SuperMax Unit, P.O. Box 400, Grady, AR 71644-0400, and to the ADC Offices. Plaintiff Dillard must file a substituted complaint containing the information in Section III of this Order within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/25/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. Meinzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wayne Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?