Rounds v. Southern Heritage Health and Rehabilitation LLC

Plaintiff: Louise Rounds
Defendant: Southern Heritage Health and Rehabilitation LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv00276
Filed: July 20, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Desha
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Rounds's lawyers have done the math. The Court orders the Clerk to make the following payments using the money in the Court's registry. A $3,329.66 check payable to Louise Rounds.A $14,005.13 check payable to Sandra Harris. A $1,500.00 check payable to Risie Howard. A $1,165.21 check, the remaining balance, payable to Southern Heritage Health and Rehabilitation, LLC. Rounds and her lawyers must file a satisfaction of Judgment after they get the money. Rounds's amended motions, 126 & 128 , are granted; Rounds's motions, 125 & 127 , are denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/19/2015. (jak)
May 14, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Rounds is entitled to have the Amended Judgment satisfied from the money in the Court's registry, with any balance being refunded to Southern Heritage. The Court therefore directs the parties to confer, do the math, and report to the Court by 18 May 2015. A satisfaction of Judgment will also need to be prepared. Rounds' motion to invest funds, 123 , is denied as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/2015. (jak)
April 10, 2015 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motions, 117 and 118 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/10/2015. (jak)
February 6, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified Southern Heritage's appeal-related motion, 108 . The Court stays execution on its 12 January 2015 Judgment. Southern Heritage shall deposit $2,000.00 into the registry of the Court by 13 February 2015. The Court directs the Clerk to hold the funds in an interest bearing account. After the Court resolves the fee issues, the Court will fix the final amount needed to support supersedeas. If Southern Heritage believes that the deposit or any bond need not cover any fee award, it should provide supporting authority in its brief about Ms. Harris's fees. The Court will direct the Clerk to issue supersedeas after we've tied up the particulars on fees, costs, and interest, and after Southern Heritage provides surety in a final amount and form. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/6/2015. (jak)
January 12, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Louise Rounds against Southern Heritage Health and Rehabilitation LLC for $1013.96, for post-judgment interest as provided by law, and for costs and a reasonable attorney's fees as the Court may later allow on timely motion. Post-judgment interest will accrue at 0.22% annum from today until this Judgment is paid. All Rounds's other claims are dismissed with prejudice, 76 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
December 3, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Rounds is entitled to costs as allowed by law and a reasonable attorney's fee. The Court will withhold entering judgment until 12 January 2015 to give the parties time to confer about costs and the fee. Joint status report due by 19 December 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2014. (jak)
November 26, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For reasons the Court will explain on the record at the pretrial Monday morning, Southern Heritage's motion in limine, 83 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/26/2014. (jak)
November 20, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion to Recuse. Rounds's 61 Motion in Limine is denied without prejudice as moot. Southern Heritage's 63 Motion in Limine is granted by agreement on references to the other wage and hour case and any remarks about counsel for Southern Heritage's law firm and otherwise denied without prejudice as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/20/2014. (jak)
November 14, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment except on one claim. Rounds's FMLA-entitlement claim about denied leave to care for her mother in June 2011 is for the jury on the record presented. Southern Heritage is entitled to Judgment as a matter of law on all other claims. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2014. (jak)
October 28, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: I note the Clerk's report on the recusal issue. Based on the parties' waivers, I'll stay on the case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/28/2014. (jak)
October 20, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to notify the clerk in writing by 27 October 2014 that any disqualification is waived regarding recusal. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rounds v. Southern Heritage Health and Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Rounds
Represented By: Sandra Young Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Heritage Health and Rehabilitation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?