Bass v. University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff et al

Plaintiff: Letsie Bass
Defendant: University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff, Calvin Johnson, Elbert Bennett and University of Arkansas System
Case Number: 5:2012cv00286
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 72 Order that was entered on this date, it is considered and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/29/2015. (rhm)
September 16, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 28 defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 32 defendants' motion to dismiss first amended complaint; dismissing defendant UAPB; and substituting Dr. Lau rence B. Alexander for Defendant Calvin Johnson. The Court construes Ms. Bass's first amended complaint as naming the University of Arkansas System through the Board of Trustees as a defendant. This case will proceed on Ms. Bass's claims u nder 42 U.S.C. §§ 1981 and 1983 against Mr. Bennett in his official capacity for prospective injunctive relief only and on Ms. Bass's Title VII sex discrimination, retaliation, and hostile work environment claims. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 09/16/2014. (rhm) (Docket text modified on 9/16/2014 (thd).
December 17, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 16 Motion to Strike 13 Amended Complaint ; and granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Ms. Bass's amended complaint is due ten days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/17/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letsie Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas at Pine Bluff
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bell
Represented By: Joann C. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bell
Represented By: Joann C. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbert Bennett
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bell
Represented By: Joann C. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas System
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bell
Represented By: Joann C. Maxey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?