Butler v. Hubbard et al
Plaintiff: James E Butler
Defendant: Anderson, Massey, Jacqueline Carswell and Connie Hubbard
Case Number: 5:2012cv00295
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING 39 Report and Recommendations; therefore, the 27 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts Corizon, Hubbard, and Murray is GRANTED, and pltf's claims against them are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/15/13. (vjt)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ADOPTING 38 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, deft Anderson's motion to quash 32 is granted and deft Anderson is dismissed without prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/7/13. (vjt)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 32 defendant Anderson's Motion to Quash be granted and that Defendant Anderson be dismissed without prejudice from this action. Objections must be received no later than 14 days from the date of this finding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/13/13. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 9/13/2013 to correct the filing event and the description of the document filed.)(thd).
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the deft Dr. Roland Anderson, and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint on defendant in care of Corizon, Inc., 12647 Olive Blvd., P.O. Box 419052, St. Louis, MO 64141-9052, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/10/13. (kpr)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 11 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted on Roland Anderson. The plaintiff shall have one last opportunity in which to provide a current address for Roland Anderson within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/27/13. (kpr)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Dr. Roland Anderson and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/12. (kpr)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING 5 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts Carswell and Massey are dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/12. (vjt)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that the Clerk of the Court prepare summons for defts Hubbard, Anderson, Murray and Corizon. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and Amended Complaint on defts in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/7/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Carswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?