McEwing v. Shores et al

Plaintiff: Andre D McEwing
Defendant: J Banks, Cockrell, Hayes, J Byers, James Plummer, J Price, Newton, Rowe, F Washington, T Spencer, Hucherson, M L Drayer and Shores
Case Number: 5:2012cv00298
Filed: August 3, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2015 218 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice McEwing's claims against Rowe, Spencer, Moore, Jones, Poe, Johnson, Cooley, Stevens, Washington, Drayer, Ables, Shelly Byers, Newton, Price, and John Does. McEwing's claims are dismissed with prejudice against Hutcheson, Shores, Cockrell, Hayes, Banks, Allen, Jared Byers, and Plummer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/22/2015. (jak)
December 23, 2014 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 206 Motion to Clarify. The remaining claim against Plummer is that he denied McEwing a shower. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/23/2014. (jak)
December 10, 2014 203 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 198 Motion for Continuance, denying 202 Motion to Strike. Docket number 193 , and all attachments, sealed. Recommendation 195 adopted in part and declined in part. Motion for Summary Judgment 187 granted in part and denied in part. Motion for Summary Judgment 191 granted. McEwing's claims against Spencer, Moore, Jones, Poe, Johnson, Cooley, Stevens, Washington, Drayer, Ables, Shelly Byers, and Newton are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. McEwing& #039; s property claims against Price are dismissed without prejudice. Two claims remain in this case: the property claim against Plummer; and the excessive-force claims against Hutcheson, Shores, Cockrell, Hayes, Banks, Allen, and Jared Byers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/10/2014. (jak)
February 13, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as modified 130 Opposed Recommendation. The Court directs counsel for the Arkansas Attorney General to provide Allen's first name by 20 February 2014. For good cause, the window for serving him is reopened until 20 March 2014. All McEwing's claims against all the John Does are dismissed by agreement without prejudice. McEwing's 135 request for a hearing is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/13/2014. (jak)
November 27, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying Plaintiff that he must provide identification with addresses for John Does within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/27/2013. (srw)
May 31, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide an address at which M. Rowe may be served within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of all claims against Defendant Rowe without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/31/2013. (srw)
February 12, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding service is appropriate for all Defendants; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of 2 , 17 , & 22 Plaintiff's Complaint and Amended Complaints with summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/12/2013. (srw)
January 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED ORDER amending 18 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct; and granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint to include only Stephen Cockrell, Robert Hutchinson, Major Byers, James Plummer, Lt. Shores, and John Does. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/18/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEwing v. Shores et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cockrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hucherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M L Drayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre D McEwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?