Hickman v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Tony A Hickman
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2012cv00309
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's Order entered in this case, on this date, it is considered, ordered and adjudged that the petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 05/07/2014. (rhm)
December 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Submission of Material and Briefing, as set forth in this Order. The parties shall submit these materials no later than February 21, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/19/13. (kpr)
May 31, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, judgment will be entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice; the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/31/13. (vjt)
August 20, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing petitioner to either pay the $5.00 filing fee in full or file a properly completed ifp application within 30 days of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to petitioner an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/20/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickman v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony A Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?