Meade v. Dermott, City of et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Meade
Defendant: Dermott, City of, Dermott Arkansas City Council, Floyd Gray, Dermott Police Department and Michael Wolfe
Case Number: 5:2012cv00315
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT: Judgment is entered for the Plaintiff against Separate Defendant Michael Wolfe in the sum of $25,000, minus payments made, plus Court costs of $450 and attorney's fees in the amount of $10,000, all of which shall bear post-judgment interest at the rate of %10 per annum from judgment until satisfaction and all of which execution shall immediately issue and that the Defendant is ordered to prepare a schedule, verified by Affidavit, as aforesaid and to file same with the Clerk of Court as aforesaid. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/22/2014. (ks)
April 1, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against the City are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 04/01/2014. (rhm)
January 27, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting the jury trial in this case to Monday, May 19, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Pine Bluff, Arkansas. All ddls remain as previously scheduled. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/27/14. (kpr)
November 1, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant Michael Wolfe's 35 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/1/13. (kpr)
December 12, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss separate deft Dermott Police Department. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/12/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meade v. Dermott, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Meade
Represented By: Jack R. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott Arkansas City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermott Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?