Reid v. Warrener et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Defendant: Vernon Robertson, Crystal Woods and Warrener
Case Number: 5:2012cv00338
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT dismissing Reid's 2 Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/30/2014. (jak)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER suspending 33 Final Scheduling Order based on the parties' settlement. The 12 May jury trial is cancelled. The Court vacates its earlier 51 Transport Order. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice unless a party seeks some relief before 29 May 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/9/2014. (jak)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the attendance of Plaintiff Andrew Reid to the Jury Trial scheduled at 8:15 a.m. on 12 May 2014 and each day thereafter until completion of the trial. The Court further directs the Arkansas Department of Correction to send Reid's complete institutional and medical files with him and to allow Reid to bring any legal papers he wants to court. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/28/2014. (jak)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 21 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 18 Reid's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/1/13. (kpr)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 13 Answer to Amended Complaint. Defendant Mark Warner has supplied his correct name, and the Clerk is directed to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of this deft. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/29/13. (kpr)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Warrener, Woods, and Robertson. The U.S. Marshal shall serve these defts with a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/1/12. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Warrener et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?