Jones v. Golden et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Defendant: Darryl Golden, Grant Harris, James Gibson, Jan Scussel, Mark Wheeler, Sheila Sharp, James Banks, Dinah Tyler, Raymond Naylor and Virgia Allen
Case Number: 5:2012cv00423
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 122 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety, except the final sentence before the conclusion, which is dictum. The defendants have judgment over plaintiff on his First Amendment and Fourteenth Amendment claims, and that plaintiff's 2 complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/3/2015. (ks)
September 3, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 89 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; denying 72 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/3/2014. (ks)
November 26, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that because the censored items are not in the record, the defts have not met their burden, so defts' 34 Motion to Dismiss is denied; in all other respects, the Court adopts the 58 Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/26/13. (vjt)
July 10, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous is construed by the Court to be a motion for summary judgment. Defendants shall file a brief and any relevant evidence in support of such (including affidavits) within 20 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendants' filings within 15 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/10/13. (kpr)
May 16, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/16/13. (kpr)
March 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay; granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous (, Replies due by 4/15/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/26/13. (kpr)
January 22, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file an application to proceed ifp within 15 days of the entry of this Order. The Clerk is hereby directed to forward to Plaintiff an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/22/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Golden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Scussel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinah Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgia Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?