Black-Tipton Limited Partnership LLLP et al v. Black-Dunklin Limited Partnership LLLP et al
Plaintiff: |
Deborah D Tipton, Deborah Dunklin Tipton Charitable Foundation, Black-Tipton Limited Partnership LLLP and Deborah Dunklin Tipton GST QSST Trust |
Defendant: |
George H Dunklin Jr Charitable Foundation, M E Black Farms Inc and Black-Dunklin Limited Partnership LLLP |
Case Number: |
5:2013cv00002 |
Filed: |
January 2, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas |
Office: |
Pine Bluff Office |
County: |
Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
D. P. Marshall |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2014 |
Filing
131
AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/24/2014. (ljb)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
130
JUDGMENT: consistent with 129 order, this case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the stipulation and consent by the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/22/2014. (ljb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Black-Tipton Limited Partnership LLLP et al v. Black-Dunklin Limited Partnership LLLP et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Deborah D Tipton |
Represented By: |
John E. Tull, III |
Represented By: |
Everett Clarke Tucker, IV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Deborah Dunklin Tipton Charitable Foundation |
Represented By: |
John E. Tull, III |
Represented By: |
Everett Clarke Tucker, IV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Black-Tipton Limited Partnership LLLP |
Represented By: |
John E. Tull, III |
Represented By: |
Everett Clarke Tucker, IV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Deborah Dunklin Tipton GST QSST Trust |
Represented By: |
Everett Clarke Tucker, IV |
Represented By: |
John E. Tull, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: George H Dunklin Jr Charitable Foundation |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Henry, III |
Represented By: |
Perry Lee Wilson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: M E Black Farms Inc |
Represented By: |
John Keeling Baker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Black-Dunklin Limited Partnership LLLP |
Represented By: |
Robert L. Henry, III |
Represented By: |
Perry Lee Wilson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?