Grissom v. White et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Elisha Grissom
Defendant: Latricia White, James Gibson, Kay Howell and Amanda McClain
Case Number: 5:2013cv00024
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendant Latricia White and against plaintiff Wesley Elisha Grissom. The relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/09/2015. (rhm)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. The Court conducted a pretrial hearing on 9/28/2015 and grants in part and denies in part 123 Mr. Grissom's motion in limine and grants in part and denies in part 134 Ms. White's motion in limine. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/1/2015. (thd) (Docket text modified on 10/1/2015 to correct a typographical error.) (thd).
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER, the parties have not consented to proceed before a U. S. Magistrate Judge, and they have requested a jury trial; therefore, the Honorable Kristine G. Baker, U. S. District Judge, is notified that this action is ready to be set on her docket for a jury trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/17/2014. (kcs)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER adopting 92 94 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Dispositions in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. Wesley Elisha Grissom's claims against Ms. McClean are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr. Grissom's claims against separate defendants James Gibson, Kay Howell, Grant Harris, Jada Lawr ence, and Wendy Kelley are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Mr. Grissom may proceed with his 42 U.S.C. § 1983 excessive force and pendent state law battery claims against separate defendant Latricia White. Mr. Grissom's request for monetary damages against Ms. White in her official capacity is dismissed with prejudice; denying 100 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/8/2014. (ks)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER that the remainder of 60 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel filed by Wesley Elisha Grissom is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/15/2014. (kcs)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying, in part, 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/24/2013. (kcs)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND PARTIAL DISPOSITION 52 ; denying 41 Motion to Dismiss Party. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket sheet to reflect that defendant McLane is "Amanda McLean". Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/13/13. (kpr)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING granting 5 Partial Report and Recommendations and finding as moot 14 Motion for Service. The Clerk is directed to prepare summons for defts White, Howell and Gibson. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, and this Order on them through the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for deft McClain, and the U.S. Marshall is directed to serve her through the Humphries & Lewis Law Firm. The Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/1/13. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grissom v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Elisha Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latricia White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?