Glover v. Hunter et al

Plaintiff: Alvin Glover
Defendant: G Bolin and C Hunter
Case Number: 5:2013cv00065
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 30 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. The Court certifies that an ifp appeal would not be taken from this Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/3/13. (kpr)
June 13, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Notice (Other) filed by G Bolin. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for deft C. Hunter, and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint and summons on deft at 4010 South Mulberry Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603-7000, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/13/13. (kpr)
June 10, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Plaintiff wishes to respond to 16 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, he should do so within 21 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/10/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glover v. Hunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?