Woods v. Brookshire Grocery Company et al

Plaintiff: Carlous Woods
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Company and Steve Bennett
Case Number: 5:2013cv00067
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon agreement of the parties, the time for defendants to file a motion for summary judgment is hereby extended up to and including July 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/2/2014. (jak)
January 16, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to 45 and 47 Motions due by January 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/16/2015. (jak)
March 19, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 75 Opinion and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered, and Adjudged that this case be, and it hereby is, dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/19/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Brookshire Grocery Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlous Woods
Represented By: Sandra Young Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.