Leggett v. Corizon Inc et al

Plaintiff: Charles H Leggett
Defendant: Connie Hubbard and Corizon Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv00180
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 83 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/2014. (ks)
October 17, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 65 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety; granting 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's complaint against defendants York, McKinney, Fallhowe, Floss, and Keldie is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. All other allegations against defendant Hubbard, excluding the air cast and pain medication allegations, are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/17/2014. (ks)
August 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Connie Hubbard and Deborah York. the United States Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint (Doc. No.6) and summons on Defendants in care of Humphries and Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/13/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leggett v. Corizon Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Leggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?