Odum v. Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Jason Odum
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Jimmy Banks, Joe Page, III, Curtis Meinzer and Richard Thrower
Case Number: 5:2013cv00241
Filed: July 31, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT: Odum's failure-to-protect claim against Hobbs, Banks, Page, and Meinzer and his retaliation claim against Hobbs are dismissed without prejudice. Odum's excessive force claim against Thrower and his retaliation claim against Thrower, Banks, Page, and Meinzer are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/20/2015. (jak)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 40 through 43 that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order; Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all facts in 40 being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/28/2014. (kcs)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons on defendants Hobbs, Banks, Page, Meinzer, and Thrower. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint and this Order on defendants without prepayment of fees therefore. The 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. An in forma pauperis appeal of any portion of this Order would notbe taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/8/13. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odum v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Meinzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thrower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?