Champion v. Warren et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Champion
Defendant: Williams Warren and Estella Bland
Case Number: 5:2013cv00242
Filed: August 1, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2016 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 156 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendant William Warren's 145 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; Plaintiff's 148 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied; Mr. Champion's claims are dismissed with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/16/2016. (mcz)
March 30, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 51 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendant Estella Bland's 42 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Court dismisses with prejudice Jerry Champion's claims against Ms. Bland, and Ms. Bland is removed as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2015. (mcz)
June 2, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 27 PARTIAL FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and denying 22 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/02/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?