Fields v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Marcus Fields
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00297
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 45 Order entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this action is dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/21/2015. (rhm)
July 2, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects 19 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition and denying 10 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/02/2014. (rhm)
June 10, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion for Order; and granting in part and denying in part 16 and 17 Motions to Compel. The Respondent is directed to file with the Court and provide a copy to Petitioner the pleadings specified in its Order. All other requests are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/10/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Eileen Woods Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?