McClard v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Jeremy Wayne McClard
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00315
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Order entered in this matter on this date the Court dismisses with prejudice plaintiff Jeremy McClard's 2 petition for writ of habeas corpus. The Court denies a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/24/2015. (rhm)
February 7, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/07/2014. (kcs)
January 2, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Petitioner to file on or before 02/3/2014 a Reply addressing the arguments for dismissal raised in 16 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Ray Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/02/2014. (kcs) (Docket text modified on 1/2/2014 to correct the reply deadline).(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClard v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Wayne McClard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?