Jackson v. Tucker et al

Plaintiff: Kim Derick Jackson
Defendant: Jim Tucker, Allen Spencer and Vetsch Candies
Case Number: 5:2013cv00355
Filed: November 18, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing with prejudice the complaint and all claims in this action against the defendant. The Court retains complete jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this Order and to reopen the action if it is satisfactorily shown that settlement has not been completed and further litigation is necessary. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/22/2017. (ljb)
April 8, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF MISTRIAL. The Court declares a mistrial as to the claims of Kim Derick Jackson against Allen Spencer. A new trial date will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 04/08/2016. (alm)
January 27, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of defendant Candace Briggs, as set forth in her 9 answer. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/27/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Tucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Derick Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vetsch Candies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?