Stricklin v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Joshua A Stricklin
Defendant: Cynthia Reed, Arkansas Department of Correction and Justine Minor
Case Number: 5:2013cv00385
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing 2 Complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/2014. (jak)
April 9, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; dismissing, as moot, 19 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO and 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 26 Plaintiff's Moti on to Limit or Terminate Deposition; and denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for a Bench Trial. The Clerk is directed to REFRAIN from docketing any future Discovery request or responses from Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/09/2014. (kcs)
February 19, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER granting 10 MOTION to Take Deposition from Joshua Stricklin filed by Cynthia Reed. Defendant must, on or before 3/17/2014, comply with the instruction in this Order regarding the preservation of video recordings and photographs. The parties must complete discovery on or before 6/16/2014 and file any dispositive motions on or before 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/19/2014. (kcs)
January 23, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for defendant Reed. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, complaint and this Order on her through the ADC Compliance Office without prepayment of fees therefor. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Minor are dismissed without prejudice. The claims against the Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)
December 23, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/23/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklin v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justine Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?