Dunahue v. Hobbs
Plaintiff: Reginald Dunahue
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2013cv00391
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 11 order entered this date, this Court denies and dismisses with prejudice petitioner Reginald Dunahue's 2 petitions for writ of habeas corpus and declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/03/2014. (rhm) (Docket text modified on 11/3/2014 to correct a typographical error). (jak)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to close Case No. 5:13cv00392. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/2/2014. (ks)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidate this case with Case No. 5:13-cv-00392. Mr. Dunahue's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of Mr. Dunahue's habeas corpus petitions (5:13 cv00391, docket entry #2 and 5:13cv00392, docket entry #2), and a copy of this Order on the Respondent Ray Hobbs and the Arkansas Attorney General, by regular mail. Director Hobbs should file an answer or other response to the petitions within twenty (20) days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/30/2013. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunahue v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Dunahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Pamela Rumpz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?