Green v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: James Edward Green, Jr
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00009
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 58 Order entered this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that petitioner James Edward Green, Jr.'s petition is dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/16/2014. (rhm)
May 8, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING 16 PARTIAL FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/08/2014. (rhm)
May 7, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court does not see how Mr. Green's double jeopardy argument would benefit from the requested documents. If the Court determines that the requested documents are necessary for the resolution of this matter based upon further review of the record, the Findings and Recommendation, and any objections thereto filed by Mr. Green, the Court will direct a request for the documents from the appropriate source. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 05/07/2014. (rhm)
January 16, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL directing the Clerk of the Court to reassign pursuant to 18 U.S.C. Section 455. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/16/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: Kent G. Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?