Washington v. Cherry et al

Plaintiff: Marcus L Washington
Defendant: Karl Cherry, Patricia Baxter and Gayland Lay
Case Number: 5:2014cv00014
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 25 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/24/2014. (ks)
June 4, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail a copy of 20 Proposed Findings and Recommendations to Washington at his current address. The time within which Washington must file any objections is extended up to and including June 18, 2014. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/4/2014. (jak)
April 25, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to provide to the Court complete copies of the grievances at issue in this case within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/25/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Cherry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Cherry
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Baxter
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayland Lay
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus L Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?