Stivers v. Peppers et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Stivers
Defendant: Sonja Peppers, Ramona Huff and Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 5:2014cv00034
Filed: February 3, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Stivers's claims against Huff, Peppers-Davis, Cameron, Chism, Floss, Correct Care Solutions, and Corizon Inc, are dismissed with prejudice. Stivers's claim against Kelley is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/29/2015. (jak)
March 30, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file on or before 4/27/2015, a Response to 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ron Chism, Wendy Kelly, Roger Cameron and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/30/2015. (kcs)
September 17, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Corizon Inc, Robert A Floss, Correct Care Solutions, and Sonja Peppers-Davis. The parties must complete discovery on or before 11/24/2014 and file dispositive motions on or before 12/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/17/2014. (kcs)
August 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 and 38 Motions. The Clerk is directed to file a copy of those Motions as "Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons for Defendants Floss, Corrective Care Solutions Inc., and Coriz on Inc. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the complaint, amended complaint, second amended complaint, third amended complaint, fourth amended complaint, and this Order on them through the Humphries and Odum law firm. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must file within thirty days of the entry of this Order, an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/18/2014. (jak)
August 15, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 MOTION to Dismiss Party. Plaintiff's claims against Huff are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/2014. (jak)
March 4, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for Defendants Peppers, Huff, and Kelly. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons, the complaint, and this Order on Kelly through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees and costs or securit y therefor. The summons, complaint, and this Order must be served on Peppers and Huff through the Humphries & Odum law firm without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Stivers's claim against Cameron and Ronchism is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/28/2014. (ks)
February 5, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/05/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stivers v. Peppers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Stivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?