Maxwell/G-Doffee v. Perez et al

Plaintiff: Don Merceleany R Maxwell/G-Doffee
Defendant: Sandra Perez, John Doe, Stevenson, Boston, John Does, Hunter, Brown, Chamber and Strickland
Case Number: 5:2014cv00077
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court directs Maxwell/G-Doffee to supplement his motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis, 88 , with an updated certified copy of his trust fund account statement for the last six months. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2015. (jak)
May 19, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Maxwell/G-Doffee's claims against John Does, and his retaliation claim against Chambers, are dismissed without prejudice. Maxwell/G-Doffee's claims against Perez, Stevenson, Boston, Hunter, Green/ Mcdowell, and Strickland, and all his remaining claims against Chambers, are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/19/2015. (jak)
January 20, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court sees no legal error or abuse of discretion in Magistrate Judge Kearney's ruling on the motion to take a deposition. Plaintiff's appeal, 54 , fails; the challenged Orders, 51 and 53 , are affirmed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/20/2015. (jak)
May 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendant Sandra Perez and directing the US Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and 2 Complaint at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Directing the Plaintiff to file additional identifying information about Defendant Brown within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/29/2014. (rhm)
March 17, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/17/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell/G-Doffee v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Merceleany R Maxwell/G-Doffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?