Bargo v. Kelly et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Allen Bargo
Defendant: Wendy Kelly, Randy Watson, Cheryl Jones and Dean Yancy
Case Number: 5:2014cv00078
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 106 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and denying 104 plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/18/2015. (kdr)
August 28, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 92 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting in part and denying in part 82 Defendants' motion for summary judgment. Defendants' motion is granted to the extent that plaintiff's claims against them in their official capacities for monetary damages are dismissed. Defendants' motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/28/2015. (kdr)
April 7, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 69 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; denying 50 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; and denying 71 request to lift the 3/24/2015, protective order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/7/2015. (kdr)
September 2, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 21 Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety. Plaintiff Jerome Bargo's 4 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bargo v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Yancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Allen Bargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?