Stricklin v. Kittrell et al

Plaintiff: Joshua A Stricklin
Defendant: K Bowman, R Mehta, Albert Kittrell, M Rector, Shawn Richard and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2014cv00092
Filed: March 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice the claims against Kittrell and Bowman. The claims against Mehta, Rector, Richard, and Kelley are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/27/2014. (jak)
August 1, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 41 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION. Stricklin's claims against Bowman are dismissed with prejudice. Stricklin should provide the Court with an updated address by 21 August 2014 or his complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/2014. (jak)
July 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as modified 25 Partial Recommended Disposition. Stricklin's claims against Kittrell are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/3/2014. (jak)
June 30, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing plaintiff sixty (60) days from the date of this Order to find a valid service address for Dr. Mehta and to file a "Motion for Service" so that service can be attempted upon Dr. Mehta at a valid address.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 06/30/2014. (plm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stricklin v. Kittrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A Stricklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?