Vann v. Olson et al

Plaintiff: Clayton Lamont Vann
Defendant: Micheline Olson, Connie Hubbert, Aleeshia Quinones, Deborah York and Ojivgo Iko
Case Number: 5:2014cv00118
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 103 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/30/2015. (rhm)
April 27, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety in all respects 68 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition; and granting in part and denying in part 51 Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. As to defendant Aleeshia Qui nones, Mr. Vann is allowed to proceed only on those claims that arose on April 3, 2013, and that are described in grievance VSM13-01286. As to defendants Connie Hubbard, Deborah York, and Ojiugo Iko, Mr. Vann is allowed to proceed only on those claim s that arose during the period from April 3, 2013, to August 6, 2013, and that were properly exhausted in grievances VSM13-01286, VSM13-02342, VSM13-02688, and VSM13-02913. All other claims against defendants Ms. Quinones, Ms. Hubbard, Ms. York, and Dr. Iko are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/27/2015. (ljb)
November 5, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 51 and 52 as set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to timely comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/05/2014. (kcs)
October 24, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, as moot, 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/24/2014. (kcs)
October 14, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 33 39 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED PARTIAL DISPOSITIONS in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying Plaintiff Clayton Lamont Vann's 11 motion for preliminary injunction; dism issing Defendant Wendy Kelly without prejudice due to failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/14/2014. (rhm)
July 30, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 07/30/2014. (kcs)
April 3, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/03/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Olson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Lamont Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheline Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleeshia Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ojivgo Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?