Barbee v. Ellis et al

Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Defendant: Cheri Ellis, Aundrea Weekly, Moore, Marie E Austin, Jason Boyd, John Doe and Angelika Smarjesse
Case Number: 5:2014cv00265
Filed: July 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 160 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Cheri Ellis and Aundrea Weekly, and without prejudice in all other respects; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/6/2016. (ljb)
March 8, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the portion of the partial recommended disposition 134 recommending that summary judgment be granted on the plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Cheri Ellis and Aundrea Weekly in their official capacities; plaintiff&# 039;s claims for monetary damages against the defendants in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice; the Court declines to adopt the remainder of the partial recommended disposition; rather than rule on the remaining aspects of the mot ion for summary judgment, the Court refers this action to US Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau for forther proceedings consistent with this Order; specifically Judge Cavaneau will conduct the discovery hearing that he has recommended be held, set de adlines for any other production as he deems appropriate, set a deadline for the plaintiff to respond to the motion for summary judgment 100 on the merits and issue a recommended disposition that addresses the merits of the motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/8/16. (tjb)
March 1, 2016 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition 133 ; plaintiff's claims against defendants Jason Boyd and John Doe are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/1/16. (tjb)
April 17, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 76 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying as moot 66 Motion to Compel; granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Moore are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/17/2015. (ks)
April 14, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to provide his current mailing address no later than 30 days after this order's entry date. Plaintiff's failure to do so will result in the recommended dismissal of his complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/14/2015. (ks)
October 7, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted with respect to plaintiff's claims against Smarjesse. Plaintiff's claims against Smarjesse are dismissed without prejudice, and Smarjesse is removed as a party defendant. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/7/2014. (ks)
July 31, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations with respect to the recommendation that the suit go forward against the ADC Defendants but not adopted with respect to the recommendation that Cheri Ellis and Jason Boyd be dismissed. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, this Order, and summons, upon Ellis and Boyd without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/31/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbee v. Ellis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester O Barbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheri Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aundrea Weekly
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie E Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelika Smarjesse
Represented By: Jonathan Quentin Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?