Schwarm v. Hubbard et al

Plaintiff: Brian Scott Schwarm
Defendant: Connie Hubbard, William Kirk, James T Banks, Rory L Griffin and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2014cv00276
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 75 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. The 64 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Connie Hubbard and William Kirk is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 2 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to his claims ag ainst Hubbard and Kirk, and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/15/2015. (mcz)
March 2, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Partial Report and Recommendations: The 45 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Banks, Griffin and Hobbs is GRANTED, and they are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and removed as party Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/2/2015. (mcz)
February 24, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 52 Partial Report and Recommendations. The 26 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Connie Hubbard and William Kirk is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 2/24/2015. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwarm v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Scott Schwarm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory L Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?