Lamar v. Hubbard et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Deshawn Lamar
Defendant: Connie Hubbard and Micheline Olson
Case Number: 5:2014cv00345
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2016 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 92 Recommended Disposition. Anthony Deshawn Lamar's claims are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/5/2016. (mcz)
September 18, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mr. Lamar to file a response opposing the motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Hubbard. To be considered, the response must be filed within fourteen days of this Order. If Mr. Lamar files a response, he must also file a separate, short statement setting forth the disputed facts that he believes must be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/18/2015. (jak)
October 10, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to re-issue summons for Ms. Olson at her last known address, as provided under seal. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons, with a copy of the 2 Complaint and any attachments, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or the posting of security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/10/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamar v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Deshawn Lamar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micheline Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?