Smith v. Rector et al

Plaintiff: Courtney Smith
Defendant: Annie Rector, Robert Parker, Niya W Battles, John Doe and Meads
Case Number: 5:2015cv00015
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 47 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/25/2015. (ks)
May 27, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 32 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants Annie R ector and Alexis Mead are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Defendants Annie Rector and Alexis Mead's request for a "with prejudice" dismissal is DENIED. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/27/2015. (ks)
March 4, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 13 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Robert Parker and Niya W. Battles are DISMISSED without prejudice f or failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Rector et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Rector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niya W Battles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?