Chestang v. Simpson et al

Plaintiff: KeOndra M Chestang
Defendant: Simpson, Aleshia Quinones, Kennedy, Jones, Rory Griffin, Humphery, Quillen and Iko
Case Number: 5:2015cv00080
Filed: March 11, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2017 164 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 163 order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/22/2017. (ljb)
November 18, 2016 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting the 145 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects and denying 144 Plaintiff Keondra M. Chestang's motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/18/2016. (mef)
February 3, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 100 Magistrate Judge Patria Harris' Partial Recommended Disposition; denying 70 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; plaintiff's claims against defendant Humphries are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/3/16. (tjb)
November 23, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 89 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 83 motion for Court assistance; denying as moot 90 motion for ruling. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/23/2015. (ks)
July 21, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 54 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/21/2015. (ks)
May 13, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of Defendants Ojiugo Iko, Teri Kennedy, and Lesa Jones. The Clerk shall prepare a summons for Iko, Kennedy, and Jones, and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of t he summons and complaint, 2 , and this Order on them, at the addresses provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Upon re-issuance of the summons and complaint, the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to send Plainti ff's copy of process to the Clerk of the Court, who shall then remove the addresses prior to forwarding a copy to Plaintiff. No later than 30 days after this order's entry date, Plaintiff must provide a first name for Defendant Humphery, so that service may again be attempted. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in the recommended dismissal of his claims against Humphery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 5/13/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestang v. Simpson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeOndra M Chestang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleshia Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humphery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?