Iverson v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al

Plaintiff: Willie Lee Iverson
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company, 3M Company, American Optical Corporation, Does and John Doe Corporations
Cross_claimant: 3M Company and Mine Safety Appliances Company
Cross_defendant: American Optical Corporation, Mine Safety Appliances Company and 3M Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv00114
Filed: April 13, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice. All cross-claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/2015. (jak)
October 15, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noting joint notice of dismissal, 32 . All cross-claims by, and against, 3M Company are dismissed without prejudice. 3M Company is no longer a party to this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/15/2015. (jak)
June 23, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss. Joint status report due by 10 July 2015. Amended complaint due by 17 July 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/23/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iverson v. Mine Safety Appliances Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Lee Iverson
Represented By: John T. Givens
Represented By: Patrick C. Malouf
Represented By: Timothy W. Porter
Represented By: Robert Allen Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: Matthew Wade Allen
Represented By: Matthew R. Dowd
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Laura F. Rose
Represented By: G. Austin Stewart
Represented By: Lindsey O. Watson
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Margaret Oertling Cupples
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: William C. McGowin
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: 3M Company
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Margaret Oertling Cupples
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: William C. McGowin
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: Matthew Wade Allen
Represented By: Matthew R. Dowd
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Laura F. Rose
Represented By: G. Austin Stewart
Represented By: Lindsey O. Watson
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: American Optical Corporation
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Represented By: Megan D. Hargraves
Represented By: Ginger C. Hyneman
Represented By: Lyn Peeples Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Mine Safety Appliances Company
Represented By: Matthew Wade Allen
Represented By: Matthew R. Dowd
Represented By: M. Patrick McDowell
Represented By: Laura F. Rose
Represented By: G. Austin Stewart
Represented By: Lindsey O. Watson
Represented By: Charles R. Wilbanks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Margaret Oertling Cupples
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: William C. McGowin
Represented By: Mary Clay Morgan
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Clarence Webster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?