Johnson v. Russell et al

Plaintiff: Derrick Johnson
Defendant: Russell, A Watts and McConnell
Case Number: 5:2015cv00129
Filed: April 22, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 27 Order that was entered on this day, it is CONSIDERED, ORDERED, and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/23/2015. (ks)
July 21, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 16 motion for preliminary injunction. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/21/2015. (ks)
May 19, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 5 Proposed Findings and Recommendations as this Court's findings. The Court adopts the recommendation that defendants Straughn and Byers be dismissed without prejudice but not the recommendation that A. Watts be dismiss ed. Johnson's claims against Straughn and Byers are hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in formapauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/2015. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Watts
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McConnell
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?